Jeys v. King, et al.
Plaintiff: Carthell David Jeys
Defendant: Audry King, Brandon Price and Ian Young
Case Number: 1:2016cv01913
Filed: December 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Action for Failure to State a Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/19/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. This case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is 1:16-cv-01913-LJO-BAM (PC). (Marrujo, C)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISCHARGING 9 Order to Show Cause Why this Action should not be Dismissed for Failure to State a Claim, Failure to Obey a Court Order, and Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/11/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why this Action should not be Dismissed, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim, Failure to Obey a Court Order, and Failure to Prosecute; Show Cause Response Due within Twenty (20) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/14/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCREENING ORDER DISMISSING 1 COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/5/2017. Amended Complaint due by 8/7/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/11/2017. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeys v. King, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carthell David Jeys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audry King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?