Jackson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Donald Jackson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv01917
Filed: December 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re Plaintiff's 1 Social Security Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/27/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER VACATING NOVEMBER 15, 2017 ORDER (ECF No. 19 ) signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/17/2017. On November 15, 2017, an order issued requiring Defendant to consent or decline magistrate judge jurisdiction. However upon further review of the record, the Court notes that Defendant consented to magistrate judge jurisdiction on February 8, 2017. Accordingly, the order filed November 15, 2017, is HEREBY VACATED. (Valdez, E)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Re Consent or Decline Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/14/17: 5-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall file an opening brief on or before September 22, 2017; Defendants response to Plaintiffs opening brief shall be filed on or before October 2 3, 2017; Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed on or before November 7, 2017; and The parties are advised that due to the impact of social security cases on the Courts docket and the Courts desire to have cases decided in an expedient manner, requ ests for modification of the briefing scheduling will not routinely be granted and will only be granted upon a showing of good cause. Further, requests to modify the briefing schedule that are made on the eve of a deadline will be looked upon with di sfavor and may be denied absent good cause for the delay in seeking an extension. If done after a deadline, the party seeking an extension must show additional good cause why the matter was filed late with the request for nunc pro tunc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/16/2017. (Hernandez, M)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis as Moot and Directing Clerk of the Court to Issue Summons 2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/18/17. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Jackson
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Richard M. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?