Jimenez v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vicente Mejia Jimenez
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv01927
Filed: December 28, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER CLOSING the Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/27/18. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 18 Stipulation to Extend Non-Expert Discovery Cutoff Date, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/10/2018. Non-expert discovery due by 3/16/2018. (Hall, S)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/16/2017. Consent/Decline due within 10 days. Pleading Amendment Deadline 8/8/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 5/16/2017; Non-Expert 1/29/2018; Expert 4/13/2018. M id-Discovery Status Conference set for 10/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 4/27/2018; Hearing by 6/5/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: File d by 6/29/2018; Hearing by 8/21/2018. Settlement Conference set for 8/31/2018 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial set for 12/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION to CHANGE VENUE 6 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/12/2017. 1) Defendant's motion to change venue ( Doc. No. 6 ) filed on March 13, 2017, has been withdrawn; 2) The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate defendant's motion to change venue (Doc. No. 6) on the docket; and 3) The hearing on the motion to change venue set for April 18, 2017, is VACATED. (Thorp, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicente Mejia Jimenez
Represented By: Brian Joseph Bickel
Represented By: Erika Nicolalde Kavicky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Dolores Elaine Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?