Tehachapi Unified School District v. K.M. (a minor) et al
Plaintiff: Tehachapi Unified School District
Defendant: K. M. (a minor), Brenda Markham and Dean Markham
Counter_claimant: Brenda Markham, Dean Markham and K. M. (a minor)
Counter_defendant: Tehachapi Unified School District
Case Number: 1:2016cv01942
Filed: December 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Closing the Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/10/19. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER AFTER HEARING on Order to Appear, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/8/2019. (Hall, S)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER to the PLAINTIFF to PERSONALLY APPEAR and Show Cause Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Its Failure to Comply with the Court's Orders; ORDER to PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL to File a Status Report within 10 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/28/2019. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/8/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER to the PARTIES to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Their Failure to Comply with the Court's Order to File Dismissal Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/13/2019. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER adopting 53 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant the Minor's Compromise signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/11/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant the Minor's Compromise, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/28/2019. Referred to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER to Relate Actions and Reassign Judges; new case number is 1:16-cv-1942 LJO-JLT, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 02/12/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting in part Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs 42 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/25/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/10/2017. Consent/Decline due within 10 days. Pleading Amendment Deadline 6/30/2017. Administrative Record Deadline: Filing by 6/9/2017; Objections by 6/23/2017. Merits Briefing: Opening Brief by 7/21/2017; Response by 8/18/2017; Reply by 9/8/2017; Hearing by 10/17/2017. Further Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2017 at 09:15 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 8 Motion to Stay signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/10/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tehachapi Unified School District v. K.M. (a minor) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tehachapi Unified School District
Represented By: Darren J Bogie
Represented By: Stephanie Virrey Gutcher
Represented By: Kyle W Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. M. (a minor)
Represented By: Kelly Donald Kaeser
Represented By: Andrea Moore Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Markham
Represented By: Kelly Donald Kaeser
Represented By: Andrea Moore Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Markham
Represented By: Kelly Donald Kaeser
Represented By: Andrea Moore Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Brenda Markham
Represented By: Kelly Donald Kaeser
Represented By: Andrea Moore Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Dean Markham
Represented By: Kelly Donald Kaeser
Represented By: Andrea Moore Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: K. M. (a minor)
Represented By: Kelly Donald Kaeser
Represented By: Andrea Moore Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Tehachapi Unified School District
Represented By: Darren J Bogie
Represented By: Stephanie Virrey Gutcher
Represented By: Kyle W Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?