Velez, Jr. v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: Robert Velez, Jr.
Defendant: J. Lewis, P. Vasquez, U. Baniga, S. Shiesha and R. Wilson
Case Number: 1:2017cv00026
Filed: January 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADOPTING 12 13 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, and Denying 8 10 Motions for Preliminary Injunction and Default Judgment signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/26/2017. (Flores, E)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss for Plaintiff's Failure to Obey Court Orders and to State a Claim; Twenty-One (21) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/19/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 10/13/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should Not be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Obey Court Order and to State a Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/18/17. Show Cause Response Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Marrujo, C)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Deny 10 Motion for Default Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/16/17. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 01/11/2017. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velez, Jr. v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Velez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. Baniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Shiesha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?