Singleton v. Fortune et al
Plaintiff: Lamar Singleton, Sr.
Defendant: Fortune
Case Number: 1:2017cv00124
Filed: April 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER in Response to Plaintiff's 75 Objections; Twenty-Day Deadline to: (1) FILE New Objections, or (2) FILE Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel; ORDER for Clerk to Send Copy of 51 Motion to Compel to Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/12/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 56 62 Requests for the Court to Schedule a Settlement Conference at this Time signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 05/25/2018. (Flores, E)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be dismissed based on Plaintiff's failure to obey the court's ORDER of March 26, 2018 re 66 which required Plaintiff to file an opposition to defendant Fortune's MOTION to compel within thirty days; referred to Judge Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 05/22/18. Objections to F&R due by 6/8/2018 (Martin-Gill, S)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER for Clerk to Send Plaintiff a Copy of Defendant Fortune's Motion for Summary Judgment Filed on January 23, 2018 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/9/2018. Response to MSJ due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendant Fortune's Motion for Summary Judgment Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/23/2018. (Jessen, A)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff and Defendant to Notify Court Whether a Settlement Conference Would be Beneficial, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/29/18. Twenty-One Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING 53 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; ORDER EXTENDING Discovery Deadline and Deadline to File Dispositive Motions for all Parties signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/27/2017. Discovery due by 12/29/2017; Dispositive Motions filed by 1/31/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 52 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/25/17: Motion is DENIED, without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER ADOPTING 46 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER DENYING 38 Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/6/2017. (Jessen, A)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING 47 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and ORDER EXTENDING Discovery Deadline and Deadline to File Dispositive Motions for All Parties signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/6/2017. Discovery due by 10/30/2017. Dispositive Motions filed by 12/29/2017. (Jessen, A)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that Plaintiff's 38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/19/17. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within 14 Days. (Gonzalez, R)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DISCHARGING 40 Order to Show Cause and Deeming Answer Timely Filed signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/17/2017. (Jessen, A)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/26/17 ordering plaintiff is relieved of his obligation to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss. Defendant's motion to dismiss 34 is denied without prejudice; Dr. Fortune shall file a responsive pleading within 14 days. Plaintiff's request 33 is denied without prejudice. Also, ORDER for INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:15-cv-0783) to Fresno (1:17-cv-0124). (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton v. Fortune et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamar Singleton, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortune
Represented By: John Michael Feser, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?