Torres v. Peery
Petitioner: Oscar Pablo Torres
Respondent: Suzanne Peery
Case Number: 1:2017cv00169
Filed: February 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that thr Court dismiss the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus with prejudice and Decline to Issue a Certificate of Appealability re 19 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Oscar Pablo Torres ; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 03/4/2019. Objections to F&R due : 30 Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING 49 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/24/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER 20 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER Dismissing Claims from Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; ORDER Referring Matter back to Magistrate Judge for Further Proceedings signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/11/2018. (Flores, E)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss Claims From First Amended Petition 19 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/1/2018: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Directing Petitioner to File Status Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/30/17: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DECLINING to ADOPT FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS 6 ; ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's Motion for Stay and Abeyance 11 ; ORDER DIRECTING Petitioner to File Regular Status Reports, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/18/17: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Vacating 7 Order Dismissing Case; ORDER Granting Motion for Extension of Time re 9 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/31/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. CASE REOPENED. (Gonzalez, R)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Summarily Dismiss Unexhausted Petition, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/1/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty One Days. This case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is 1:17-cv-00169-LJO-JLT (HC). (Marrujo, C)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/7/2017, from Sacramento (2:17-CV-236 CKD) to Fresno (1:17-CV-169 JLT). (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Peery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oscar Pablo Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Suzanne Peery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?