Hechinger Joint Venture #1 et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Hechinger Joint Venture #1 and Hechinger Joint Venture #2
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00175
Filed: February 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, and Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER Dismissing Action without Prejudice and Allocation of Costs signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/25/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Assigning Case re Presiding Judge; new case number is 1:17-cv-00175 SAB, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 06/29/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER EXTENDING F.R.C.P. RULE 26 (a) INITIAL DISCLOSURE DEADLINE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/30/2017. Pursuant to the stipulation of the Parties, the deadline for Initial Disclosures required by Rule 26 (a)(1) shall be extended to June 30, 2017. (Hernandez, M)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Scheduling Conference from 4/21/2017 to 6/22/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A joint scheduling report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/7/2017. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hechinger Joint Venture #1 et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hechinger Joint Venture #1
Represented By: Josh Todd Fox
Represented By: Rissa Ann Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hechinger Joint Venture #2
Represented By: Josh Todd Fox
Represented By: Rissa Ann Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Randall Gery Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?