Stell v. Insect Lore Products et al
Plaintiff: Deidra Stell
Defendant: Insect Lore Products and Anita Veldboom
Case Number: 1:2017cv00235
Filed: February 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to Close this action (Stipulation), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 06/18/18. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 18 Stipulation to Amend Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/7/2018. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 6/30/2018; Expert 8/17/2018. (Hall, S)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/19/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 8/14/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 7/9/2017; Non-Expert 3/30/2018; Expert 6/11/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 12/11/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/22/2018; Hearing by 7/31/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 8/11/2018; Hearing by 9/18/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2018 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 1/9/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stell v. Insect Lore Products et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insect Lore Products
Represented By: John Richard Szewczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Veldboom
Represented By: John Richard Szewczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deidra Stell
Represented By: Randall Martin Rumph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?