Williams v. Davey et al
Plaintiff: John Williams
Defendant: David Davey, E. Cantu and Edward Sanchez
Case Number: 1:2017cv00300
Filed: March 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Case be DISMISSED, With Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted Under Section 1983 re 14 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/20/2018. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER VACATING 11 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Entered on November 17, 2017; ORDER Directing Clerk to File First Amended Complaint Lodged on December 4, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/7/2017. (Jessen, A)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that pursuant to 28:1915A and 28:1915(e), this case be Dismissed, with prejudice, based on Plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted under 1983 re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by John Williams ; referred to Judge Drozd,signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/17/2017. Objections to F&R due 14-Day deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Davey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Cantu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?