Close v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: Larry Close
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 1:2017cv00310
Filed: March 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER CLOSING CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/30/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order after 13 Notice of Settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/7/2017. (Dismissal Filing Deadline: 7/6/2017) All pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Rosales, O)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING 9 Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/26/2017. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 5/17/2017 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judg e Jennifer L. Thurston. Counsel may appear via teleconference by dialing (888) 557-8511 and entering Access Code 1652736, provided they send an e-mail to shall@caed.uscourts.gov no later than five court days before the hearing date advising of their intent to appear telephonically. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Close v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Close
Represented By: Bernard Richard Schwam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Robert Mario Forni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?