Jimenez v. Sutton
Petitioner: Oscar Jimenez
Respondent: John Sutton
Case Number: 1:2017cv00333
Filed: March 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to deny 2 MOTION to STAY; ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why 1 Petition should not be dismissed for failure to exhaust all claims; ORDER directing Clerk's Office to assign a District Judge signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/28/2017. Case assigned to District Judge, Anthony W. Ishii. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R's and Show Cause Response due within 30-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SECOND ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Motion to Stay Should Be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/12/2017. Show Cause Response or Notice to Withdraw Motion due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Motion to Stay Should be Granted, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/14/17. Show Cause Response Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez v. Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oscar Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?