Rutledge v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Kent Anthony Rutledge
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv00366
Filed: March 13, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Close this Action and Reflect Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/10/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
February 9, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendants response to Plaintiffs opening brief shall be filed on or before May 9, 2018; and Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed on or before May 24, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/9/2018. (Hernandez, M)
February 8, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discharging 15 Order to Show Cause and Granting Third Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/8/18. Deadline: 4/9/2018. (Gonzalez, R)
February 6, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER AND FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a written response to this order to show cause why this action should not be d ismissed for failure to prosecute within seven (7) days of the date of service of this order. Failure to comply with this order to show cause shall result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/6/2018. (Hernandez, M)
December 19, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall file an opening brief on or before February 5, 2018; Defendants response to Plaintiffs opening brief shall be filed on or before March 7, 2018; and Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed on or before March 22, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/19/2017. (Hernandez, M)
November 27, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall file an opening brief on or before December 20, 2017; Defendants response to Plaintiffs opening brief shall be filed on or before January 19, 2018; and Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed on or before February 5, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/27/2017. (Hernandez, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rutledge v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Anthony Rutledge
Represented By: Denise Bourgeois Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Michael K. Marriott, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?