Trujillo v. Xiong et al
Plaintiff: Jose Trujillo
Defendant: Doua Xiong and Khoua Xiong
Case Number: 1:2017cv00380
Filed: March 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Close Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/11/18. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file his First Amended Complaint, a copy of which was attached to the stipulation (Doc. 21, Ex. A), within five (5) calendar days of the date this Order is filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' response thereto shall be filed within fourteen (14) days after the First Amended Complaint is filed. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/11/2017. (Timken, A)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER regarding settlement conference procedures signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/5/2017. (Rooney, M)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER for CONTINUANCE of Mandatory Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 6/22/2017, is CONTINUED to 8/17/2017, at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by no later than 8/10/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/14/2017. (Timken, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trujillo v. Xiong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Trujillo
Represented By: Zachary Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doua Xiong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khoua Xiong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?