Monson v. Unknown Floor Officers
Plaintiff: Trenell Monson
Defendant: Unknown Floor Officers
Case Number: 1:2017cv00395
Filed: March 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING 77 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/29/2020. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 102 Motion for Court to Review Discovery Footage, without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/28/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to Reply to 100 Warden's Response, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/25/2020. Reply due within 21 days. (Rivera, O)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 93 94 Motions for Third Party Subpoena, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/29/2020. (Marrujo, C)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING 89 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER VACATING Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing, Trial and Related Deadlines; ORDER DIRECTING Defendant to Sen d Plaintiff a Copy of His Motion for Summary Judgment; and ORDER DENYING 90 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Statement and Motion for Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/13/2020. Opposition due within forty-five (45) days. (Jessen, A)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re 80 Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to Defendant's Rand Notice and ORDER Directing Clerk to Send a Copy of this Order to Assistant United States Attorney Edward Olsen and the Warden of USP Lompoc signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/16/2020. (Rivera, O)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Requesting that the Warden of USP Lompoc Respond to Plaintiff's February 26, 2020 Filing; ORDER Directing Clerk to Send a Copy of this Order, Plaintiff's Filing 80 , and Fresno County Sheriff's Office's Response 82 , to Assistant United States Attorney Edward Olsen and the Warden of USP Lompoc signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 03/03/2020. Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER REQUIRING Response from Fresno County Sheriff's Office and GRANTING Plaintiff an Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Mail a Copy of this Order to the Sheriff of Fresno County signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/27/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER RE: Documents withheld on the basis of the official information privilege, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/19/2019. ( Case Management Deadline: 30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DIRECTING Service of Subpoena by the United States Marshals Service without Prepayment of Costs; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Attach Copy of Subpoena to this Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/28/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena)(Sant Agata, S)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re: Plaintiff's for Clarification and/or Instruction 68 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/23/19. (Marrujo, C)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Following Telephonic Discovery and Status Conference; ORDER Directing Clerk to Send Plaintiff a Blank Subpoena Form AO 88B and Form USM-285 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/10/2019. Dispositive Motions filed by 1/17/2020, Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 8/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Jury Trial set for 11/3/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Flores, E)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DISCHARGING Order for Plaintiff, Warden of USP Lompoc, and Litigation Coordinator at USP Lompoc to Show Cause Why They Should Not be Sanctioned; ORDER Resetting Status and Discovery Conference; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Serve a Copy of This Order on the Warden at USP Lompoc, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/20/19. (Marrujo, C)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why he Should not be Sanctioned for Failure to Appear; ORDER for Warden and Litigation Coordinator of USP Lompoc to Show Cause why they Should not be Sanctioned for Failure to Comply with a Court Order; ORDER Directing Clerk to Serve a Copy of this Order on the Warden and Litigation Coordinator at USP Lompoc signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 07/31/2019. Show Cause Response due by 8/21/2019. (Flores, E)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Following Initial Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/24/19. (Gonzalez, R)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 35 Request for Issuance of Third Party Subpoena signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/29/2018. (Flores, E)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING 31 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER Dismissing Defendant M. Martinez from this Action, without Prejudice signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/22/2018. (Flores, E)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/18/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that Defendant M. Martinez be Dismissed from this Action, without Prejudice, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(M) re 26 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/5/18. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within 21-Days. (Gonzalez, R)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Substituting Named Defendants in Place of Unknown Officers, Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate and Directing Clerk to Complete Service Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/2/18. R. Melkonian and M. Martinez added. Unknown Floor Officers terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why the Court Should Not Issue Findings and Recommendations, Recommending That This Case Be Dismissed, Without Prejudice, for Failure to Serve signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/2/2018. Show Cause Response due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Opening Limited Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/20/17. 120-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Adopting 11 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER for this Action to Proceed Against Defendants Unknown Officer 1 and Unknown Officer 2 for Failure to Protect in Violation of the Fourteenth Amendment, and DISMISSING all other Claims and Defendants with Prejudice signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/17/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that this Action Proceed Against Defendants Unknown Officer 1 and Unknown 2 for Failure to Protect in Violation of the Fourteenth Amendment, and that all Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/27/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 10/23/2017.(Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monson v. Unknown Floor Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trenell Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Floor Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?