Beshwate et al v. BMW of North America, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard Anthony Beshwate, Jr. and Bonnie Joy Beshwate
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC and CarMax Auto Superstores California, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00417
Filed: March 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/11/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF DEADLINE TO FILE DISPOSITIVE DOCUMENTS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the request for a continuance is GRANTED and dispositive documents shall be filed on or before December 14, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/05/2018. (Hernandez, M)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS within 30 days of the date of entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/9/2018. (Hernandez, M)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING IN PART STIPULATION OF PARTIES RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE AND REVISED BRIEFING SCHEDULE, 51 . The hearing date for Defendant Carmax's Motion for Summary Judgment presently scheduled for October 3, 2018 is CONTINUED to Oct ober 24, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9. The briefing schedule for CarMax's Motion shall be based on the new, continued hearing date. The expert discovery deadline is continued to October 24, 2018; and the Pre-Trial Conference shall be continued to November 2, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/14/2018. (Timken, A)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order re stipulation to continue hearing date and revise briefing schedule regarding Defendant Carmax's Motion for Summary Judgment or Partial Summary Judgment and amend expert discovery deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/31/2018. (Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing currently set for 9/19/2018 has been CONTINUED to 10/3/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Expert Discovery due by 10/10/2018) (Rosales, O)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT CAR MAX OF NORTH AMERICA TO PROVIDE COPY OF DEPOSITIONS. Accordingly, within seven days from the date of entry of this order, Defendant CarMax shall provide the Court with an entire copy of any depositions relied on in the motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/27/2018. (Hernandez, M)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the January 12, 2018 scheduling order is amended as follows: Expert Disclosure Deadline: July 31, 2018; Supplemental Expert Disclosure Deadline: August 17, 2018; Expert Discovery Deadline: September 12, 2018; and All other dates and aspects of the January 12, 2018 scheduling order shall remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/17/2018. (Hernandez, M)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT CARMAX MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATING DECEMBER 13, 2017 HEARING. CarMax shall file an answer to complaint within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2017. (Hernandez, M)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING Defendant CarMax's 27 Motion to Dismiss ; ORDER GRANTING Defendant CarMax's 28 Motion to Strike ;Plaintiffs shall file a Second Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/3/2017. (14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER VACATING OCTOBER 4, 2017 MOTION HEARING. The Court, having reviewed the record, finds these matters suitable for decision without oral argument. See Local Rule 230(g). Accordingly, the matters are taken under submission. The previously scheduled hearing set on October 4, 2017 a.m. is vacated and the parties will not be required to appear at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/3/2017. (Hernandez, M)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re Stipulation of Parties re Filing First Amended Complaint In Lieu of Opposition to 11 Motions to Dismiss and 12 Strike; August 16, 2017 hearing for the Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike is VACATED, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/2/17. ( First Amended Complaint due by 8/15/2017) (Martin-Gill, S)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT CARMAX AUTO SUPERSTORE MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE. THE COURT RESETS THE MOTION HEARING as to 11 MOTION to DISMISS and 12 MOTION to STRIKE hearing from 6/21/2017 to 8/16/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/6/2017. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beshwate et al v. BMW of North America, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Anthony Beshwate, Jr.
Represented By: Emmett Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Joy Beshwate
Represented By: Emmett Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Robert W.K. Farrell
Represented By: Roger Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CarMax Auto Superstores California, LLC
Represented By: Kurt Andrew Schlichter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?