Acosta v. Riley et al
Plaintiff: Jose Acosta
Defendant: Margaret Riley and Sunnyside Investments, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00431
Filed: March 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Close Case and Adjust Docket to Reflect Voluntary Dismissal,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/25/17. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS on or before June 19, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/22/2017. (Hernandez, M)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT SUNNYSIDE INVESTMENTS, INC. TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Sunnyside Investments, Inc. shall file a response to the complaint on or before June 1, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/11/2017. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Riley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Acosta
Represented By: Zachary Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Riley
Represented By: Bruce A. Neilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunnyside Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?