Larry Smith v. Gonzales et al
Plaintiff: Larry Smith
Defendant: J. Gonzales, B. Johnson, A. Fritz, E. Castro, Miner, Florez, A. Scaife, Potzernitz and Gonzales
Case Number: 1:2017cv00436
Filed: March 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 45 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; ORDER Staying Deadlines for Discovery and for Filing Dispositive Motions, Pending Resolution of Defendants' Exhaustion Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 09/05/2019. (Flores, E)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Strike 48 ; ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's Surreply 47 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/13/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING 42 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/18/19. (Marrujo, C)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING 19 Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/4/18. (Marrujo, C)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that this Action Proceed only Against Defendants Sgt. Gonzalez, Johnson, Castro, Miner, Florez, and Potzernitz for use of Excessive Force; Defendants Fritz and Scaife for Failure to Protect; and Defendant Sgt. Gonzales for Retaliation; and that all other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/19/20018. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 5/7/2018. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larry Smith v. Gonzales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Scaife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Potzernitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?