Sekula v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carla S. Sekula
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Tulare Sag, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00460
Filed: March 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses in Part, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/17/19. (Marrujo, C)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Entering Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff Carla Sekula and Against Defendant FCA US LLC signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/8/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 11 Motion to Remand, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/30/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/17/2017. Consent/Decline due within 10 days. Motion to Remand Deadline 6/5/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 8/14/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 5/19/2017; Non-Exp ert 3/23/2018; Expert 6/11/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 12/4/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/19/2018; Hearing by 7/17/2018. D ispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 7/31/2018; Hearing by 9/18/2018. Settlement Conference set for 1/5/2018 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 11/26/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial set for 2/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sekula v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla S. Sekula
Represented By: Steve Mikhov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Aaron M. Brian
Represented By: Scott Steven Shepardson
Represented By: Sharon Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulare Sag, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?