Anglen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Anne Anglen
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv00461
Filed: March 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order for Plaintiff's counsel to show cause why Plaintiff's counsel should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with court order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/18/2020 Show Cause Response due by 12/9/2020. (Rosales, O.)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order DENYING Motion for Attorney Fees as MOOT, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/27/2020. (Filing Deadline: 11/17/2020) (Rosales, O.)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISCHARGING the Order to Show Cause issued on 10/14/2020, document 26 . The Court directs plaintiff, within seven days of the date of this order, to re-file the documents at issue (ECF Nos. [23-1] and [23-2]) in full compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a) and Local Rule 140(a), redacting all but the last four digits of the social security number. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/16/2020. (Rooney, M)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order for Plaintiff's counsel to show cause why Plaintiff's counsel should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with court order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/14/2020. Show Cause Response due by 11/4/2020. (Rosales, O.)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 23 Motion for Attorney's Fees; ORDER SEALING Docket Numbers 23 -1, 23 -2 and Requiring Counsel to Re-File Such Documents With Proper Redaction, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/29/2020. (Marrujo, C)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION for voluntary remand pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and for entry of judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/6/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 1/6/2018 for the filing of plaintiff's opening brief, with all other deadlines extended accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/8/2017. (Rooney, M)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 10/3/2017 for plaintiff to serve her confidential letter brief. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/5/2017. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anglen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Anne Anglen
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?