Hayden et al v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Angela L Hayden and Joshua D Buttram
Defendant: United States of America and Ashley Miller
Case Number: 1:2017cv00517
Filed: April 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1364
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Closing the Case signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 03/01/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Unopposed Request to Excuse The Postal Service Representative's In-Person Attendance at Settlement Conference. Defendant's unopposed request for the telephonic appearance of the United States Postal Service representative at the settlement conference scheduled for February 22, 2018 is GRANTED. (Doc. 23). As stated in Defendant's request, the representative should be readily available for the duration of the settlement conference. The Court caution s that meaningful settlement negotiations are expected even in the absence of the representatives in-person attendance. The Court will vacate the settlement conference and consider sanctions if, at any point, the Court finds that the settlement conference will be neither a productive nor meaningful attempt to resolve all or part of this case. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/9/2018. (Herman, H)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/11/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 2/5/2018. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 3/8/2018; Non-Expert 7/6/2018; Expert 10/5/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set fo r 5/31/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 10/19/2018; Hearing by 11/16/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 12/7/2018; Hearing by 1/11/2019. Bench Trial set for 2/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 17 Stipulation Referring the Parties for a Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/1/2017. Settlement Conference set for 2/22/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Hall, S)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Certification of Scope of Federal Employment and ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/21/17. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayden et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela L Hayden
Represented By: Matthew C. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua D Buttram
Represented By: Matthew C. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?