Williams v. Pfieffer, et al.
Plaintiff: Donald Lee Williams
Defendant: C. Pfieffer, T. Yoder, A. Terrazas, C. Mason, M. McCollough, M. Franco, H. Arreola, K. Nuntz, I. Jaime, P. Chanelo and S. Brookman
Case Number: 1:2017cv00549
Filed: April 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to CLOSE the CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/7/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE and ORDER that Inmate Witness is no longer Needed as Witness in these Proceedings, and that the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is DISCHARGED signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/5/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Donald Lee Williams, CDC# H-22608 on December 6, 2018 at 9:30a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/9/18. (Gonzalez, R)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request Filed Under Seal re 46 ; ORDER Resetting Settlement Conference; Fourteen Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/9/18. Settlement Conference set for 12/6/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Gonzalez, R)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER on Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Brookman With Prejudice (Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)), signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/10/2018. (Hellings, J)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/3/2018: Settlement Conference set for 10/30/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Hellings, J)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/16/2018: Initial Disclosures: Completed; Nonexpert Discovery Cutoff: February 28, 2019; Expert Disclosure: March 29, 2019; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure: April 26, 2019; E xpert Discovery Cutoff: May 24, 2019; Exhaustion Motion Filing Deadline: November 16, 2018; Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline: June 28, 2019; Settlement Conf.: Not Set; Status Conf: Date: January 28, 2019Time:1:30 p.m. Dept:10;Pretrial Conf.: Date: October 30, 2019 Time:10:00 a.m. Dept: 2; and Jury Trial: Date: January 7, 2020 Time:8:30 a.m. Dept: 2. (Hellings, J)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING In Part Plaintiff's 34 Motion to Extend the Scheduling Conference; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Send Donald Williams a Copy of This Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/19/18. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Copy of this order mailed to Donald Williams.) (Marrujo, C)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 29 Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/05/2018. (Flores, E)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/15/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER discharging 4 Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/9/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why Claims he is Currently Exhausting Should not be Dismissed without Prejudice for Failure to Exhaust signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/25/2017. Show Cause Response due by 5/30/2017.(Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Pfieffer, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Lee Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Pfieffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Terrazas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. McCollough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Arreola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Nuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Jaime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Chanelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Brookman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?