Valadez v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Plaintiff: Daniel Valadez
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 1:2017cv00551
Filed: April 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to dismiss for failure to state a claim 18 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/7/2017. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R's Within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER adopting 20 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending denial of 17 Motion for Injunctive Relief signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/30/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending denial of 17 MOTION for Injunctive Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/6/2017. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING 12 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING DENIAL OF 3 MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/12/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denial of 3 Motion for Injunctive Relief; Fourteen (14) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/12/2017. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 6/1/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valadez v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Valadez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?