Burdick v. Kero TV-23 et al
Plaintiff: Amy J. Burdick
Defendant: Kero TV-23, The E. W. Scripps Company and Scripps Media, Inc., improperly sued as KERO TV-23 and the E.W. Scripps Company
Case Number: 1:2017cv00591
Filed: April 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER CLOSING CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/28/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER to the PARTIES to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/14/2017. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER AFTER 15 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/20/2017. Stipulated dismissal due by 12/7/2017. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burdick v. Kero TV-23 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy J. Burdick
Represented By: Jeffrey Lee Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kero TV-23
Represented By: Sabrina Layne Shadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The E. W. Scripps Company
Represented By: Sabrina Layne Shadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scripps Media, Inc., improperly sued as KERO TV-23 and the E.W. Scripps Company
Represented By: Sabrina Layne Shadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?