Casildo, et al. v. Esparza Enterprises, Inc
Plaintiff: Olga Casildo and Jaime Chino Severiano
Defendant: Esparza Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00601
Filed: April 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); ORDER 56 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/30/2020. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING 54 an Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/9/2020. (Hall, S)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER AFTER 51 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/4/2019. Stipulated dismissal due by 1/2/2020. All other pending dates, hearings and conferences are VACATED. (Hall, S)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/7/2019. (Hall, S)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING 35 Stipulation to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/4/2019. (Hall, S)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER 26 to Permit Plaintiffs to File Third Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/30/2018. (Hall, S)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/31/2018. Pleading Amendment Deadline 8/27/2018. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 6/15/2018; Non-Expert 1/31/2019; Expert 4/18/2019. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set f or 9/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 4/30/2019; Hearing by 5/28/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/11/2019; Hearing by 7/23/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 11/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR THE RESPONSIVE PLEADING (Doc. 18 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/27/2018. Based on the stipulation of the parties (Doc. 18 ), the Court ORDERS: (1) The defendants SHALL file their responsive pleading no later than May 24, 2018. (Valdez, E)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 13 Stipulation to Stay the Entire Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/31/2017. CASE STAYED. (Hall, S)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISCHARGING 7 Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/17/2017. (Hall, S)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to PLAINTIFFS to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for the Failure to Comply with the Court's Orders and to Prosecute this Action; ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/13/2017. Show Cause Response due by 7/21/2017. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 8/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casildo, et al. v. Esparza Enterprises, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Casildo
Represented By: Eric Bryce Kingsley
Represented By: Mario Martinez
Represented By: Kelsey M. Peterson-More
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Chino Severiano
Represented By: Eric Bryce Kingsley
Represented By: Mario Martinez
Represented By: Kelsey M. Peterson-More
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esparza Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel K. Klingenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?