Fresno State Students For Life et al v. Thatcher
Plaintiff: Fresno State Students For Life, Bernadette Tasy and Jesus Herrera
Defendant: William Gregory Thatcher
Case Number: 1:2017cv00657
Filed: May 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to Close the Case (Stipulation), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 03/20/2018. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/18/2017. (Timken, A)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING 10 DEFENDANT'S Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendant shall file a response to the complaint on or before July 11, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/14/2017. (Timken, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fresno State Students For Life et al v. Thatcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fresno State Students For Life
Represented By: Travis Christopher Barham, PHV
Represented By: Michael Casey Mattox, PHV
Represented By: Michael Renberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Tasy
Represented By: Travis Christopher Barham, PHV
Represented By: Michael Casey Mattox, PHV
Represented By: Michael Renberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Herrera
Represented By: Travis Christopher Barham, PHV
Represented By: Michael Casey Mattox, PHV
Represented By: Michael Renberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gregory Thatcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?