Hendon v. Davey
Plaintiff: Carlos Hendon
Defendant: Davey
Case Number: 1:2017cv00661
Filed: May 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Dismissing Case for Failure to Pay Filing Fee, Ordering Clerk of Court to Close Case, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/23/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING 4 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; ORDER DENYING 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP; and ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Pay the Filing Fee in Full Within Thirty (30) Days signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/10/2017. (Jessen, A)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denial of 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Directing Plaintiff to Pay Filing Fee within Thirty Days Following the Order Resolving the Instant Recommendation signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/15/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 6/19/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendon v. Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Hendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?