U.S. Citrus Science Council et al v. U.S. Department of Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Citrus Science Council, Santa Paula Creek Ranch, Green Leaf Farms, Inc., CPR Farms, Bravante Produce and Richard Bagdasarian Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Department of Agriculture, Sonny Perdue and Kevin Shea
Case Number: 1:2017cv00680
Filed: May 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, and GRANTING Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 35 , 37 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/27/2018: The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs and to CLOSE THIS CASE. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 29 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Count III is DIMISSED for Lack of Standing; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss all other counts (Counts I,II, IV and VI) is DENIED, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/24/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE CORRECTED JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE; AND VACATING SEPTEMBER 14, 2017 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that:The September 14, 2017 scheduling conference is vacated; The deadline for Defendants to file a mot ion to dismiss is July 27, 2017; The deadline for Plaintiffs to file an opposition to the motion to dismiss is August 10, 2017;The deadline for Defendants to file a reply on the motion to dismiss is August 17, 2017; The hearing for any motion to dism iss or motion for summary judgment shall be set pursuant to the Local Rules in Courtroom 4 before United States District Judge Lawrence J. ONeill; The deadline for filing amendments is August 17, 2017; The deadline for Defendants to lodge the adminis trative record is September 20, 2017. The parties do not have to provide a courtesy paper copy of the administrative record; The deadline for Plaintiffs to file any motions related to the administrative record is October 4, 2017; The deadline for Pla intiffs to file a motion for summary judgment is October 18, 2017. The page limit for Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is 35 pages;The deadline for Defendants to file an opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment is November 15, 2017. The page limit for Defendants opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment is 40 pages; The deadline for Plaintiffs to file an opposition and reply on the motion for summary judgment is December 4, 2017. The page limit for Plaintiffs opposition and reply on motion for summary judgment is 30 pages; and The deadline for Defendants to file a reply on the motion for summary judgment is December 22, 2017. The page limit for Defendants reply on summary judgment is 25 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/28/2017. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Citrus Science Council et al v. U.S. Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Citrus Science Council
Represented By: Christopher Casamassima
Represented By: Kelly P. Dunbar, PHV
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt, PHV
Represented By: Robert Manhas, PHV
Represented By: David W. Ogden, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Paula Creek Ranch
Represented By: Christopher Casamassima
Represented By: Kelly P. Dunbar, PHV
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt, PHV
Represented By: Robert Manhas, PHV
Represented By: David W. Ogden, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Leaf Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Casamassima
Represented By: Kelly P. Dunbar, PHV
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt, PHV
Represented By: Robert Manhas, PHV
Represented By: David W. Ogden, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CPR Farms
Represented By: Christopher Casamassima
Represented By: Kelly P. Dunbar, PHV
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt, PHV
Represented By: Robert Manhas, PHV
Represented By: David W. Ogden, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bravante Produce
Represented By: Christopher Casamassima
Represented By: Kelly P. Dunbar, PHV
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt, PHV
Represented By: Robert Manhas, PHV
Represented By: David W. Ogden, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bagdasarian Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Casamassima
Represented By: Kelly P. Dunbar, PHV
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt, PHV
Represented By: Robert Manhas, PHV
Represented By: David W. Ogden, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?