Allen v. Commissioner of Social Security et al
Plaintiff: Ericka Allen
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security, Laura D. Ort-Presley, Travis M. Nagy and Cynthia Floyd
Case Number: 1:2017cv00702
Filed: May 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DISMISSING CASE for Failure to Comply With a Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/27/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE for Plaintiff's Failure to File Opening Brief signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/25/2018. Show Cause Response due within twenty (20) days. (Jessen, A)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED Pro Se ORDER SETTING Deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/8/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRO SE ORDER SETTING DEADLINES signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/27/2017. (Jessen, A)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRO SE ORDER SETTING DEADLINES signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/10/2017. (Jessen, A)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER striking unsigned 7 First Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/3/2017. (Amended Complaint due by 8/31/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/5/2017. First Amended Complaint due by 7/31/2017. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Commissioner of Social Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ericka Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura D. Ort-Presley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis M. Nagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?