Pasillas, et al. v. State of California, et al.

Plaintiff: Abelardo Pasillas and Silvia Patricia Valdez
Defendant: State of California and California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 1:2017cv00712
Filed: May 22, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order 83 ORDER re Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/30/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 69 ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 10/1/2018 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/17/2018. (Rooney, M)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 68 Stipulated and Protective ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/6/18. (Marrujo, C)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 59 Stipulation for dismissal as to Defendants Correctional Officers Boone and Vasquez; Order Thereon, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/27/2018. Correctional Officer Boone and Correctional Officer Vasquez terminated.. (Rosales, O)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 54 ORDER of Referral to Magistrate Judge, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/6/2018. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order 40 STIPULATION and ORDER RE: Filing of Second Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/27/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order 38 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Savage to File Initial Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/26/2017. (Flores, E)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order 35 STIPULATION and ORDER re 22 First Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/5/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order 33 STIPULATION and ORDER to extend time for Defendant, Savage to respond to amended complaint 32 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/30/2017. (Filing Deadline: 12/18/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order 21 ORDER denying 9 Motion to Dismiss and granting 14 Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/2/2017. (Amended Complaint due within 14-Days). (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pasillas, et al. v. State of California, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abelardo Pasillas
Represented By: Cameron Sehat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Patricia Valdez
Represented By: Cameron Sehat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?