United States of America v. Couri et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Edgard Couri, First American Title Insurance Company, Wesav Mortgage Corporation, GE Mortgage Services LLC, Kern County, State of California Franchise Tax Board and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00713
Filed: May 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ENTERING JUDGMENT on the United States' First Claim for Relief and DISMISSING Without Prejudice Second Claim for Relief signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/27/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Terminate this Action as to Defendants Wesav Mortgage Corporation and GE Mortgage Services, LLC ONLY Pursuant to 11 the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/22/2017. (Hall, S)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING 26 Stipulation to Continue the Mandatory Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/7/2017. Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 9/29/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 24 Stipulation to Continue the Mandatory Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/9/2017. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 9/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER APPROVING 22 Stipulation Regarding Lien Priority Between Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and the United States, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/3/2017. (Hall, S)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Approving 20 Stipulation Regarding Lien Priority Between Jordan Kaufman, Kern County Treasurer-Tax Collector, and the United States, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/31/2017. (Hall, S)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 18 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Kern County to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/27/2017. The County of Kern shall file its responsive pleading by 8/16/2017. (Hall, S)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPROVING 15 Stipulation Regarding Dismissal of Defendant First American Title Insurance Company and Disclaimer of Interest, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/25/2017. Case Closed as to Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Hall, S)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 12 Stipulation Between Plaintiff and the Franchise Tax Board; ORDER Closing Case as to the Franchise Tax Board Only, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/24/2017. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Couri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christian Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgard Couri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesav Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Mortgage Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California Franchise Tax Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?