Rhey v. Ogbuehi et al
Plaintiff: Choon Rhey
Defendant: Infeoma Ogbuehi, Felix Igbinosa, Adrian Pineda, David Lovell, Daren Freeland and Geraldo Chavez
Case Number: 1:2017cv00718
Filed: May 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to CLOSE CASE and Adjust Docket to Reflect Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/30/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER adopting 15 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, denying 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/17/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 17 Motion for Order Requiring U.S. Marshal to Serve Summons and Complaint, as Premature signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/18/2017. (Flores, E)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/21/17. Objections to F&R Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING 5 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and ORDERING Plaintiff to Submit Filing Fee, in the amount of $400.00 or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal within Forty-Five Days,signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 07/21/17. (Case Management Deadline: 30-Day) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge to Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be DENIED and Plaintiff be Ordered to Pay the Filing Fee re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/24/2017. This case has been assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is 1:17-cv-00718-AWI-SAB (PC). Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhey v. Ogbuehi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choon Rhey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infeoma Ogbuehi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Igbinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Pineda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daren Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geraldo Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?