Brim v. Schlaerth et al
Plaintiff: Eurie Brim, III
Defendant: William J. Schlaerth and Sean Mountjoy
Case Number: 1:2017cv00797
Filed: June 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/7/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel, document 7 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/30/2017. (Rooney, M)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING In Forma Pauperis Application 4 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/19/17. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brim v. Schlaerth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eurie Brim, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Schlaerth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Mountjoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?