E. & J. Gallo Winery et al v. Instituut Voor Landbouw - En Visserijonderzoek, et al.

Plaintiff: E. & J. Gallo Winery, G3 Enterprises, Inc. and MCD Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Instituut Voor Landbouw - En Visserijonderzoek, Eigen Vermogen Vh Instituut Voor Landbouw - En Visserijonderzoek and Flanders Food
Case Number: 1:2017cv00808
Filed: June 15, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2018 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Request to Seal Documents 113 , 114 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/11/2018: The redacted versions of Exhibits 1 and 2 attached to plaintiffs' opposition (Doc. Nos. 114-2, 114-3) shall remain on the court's docket. (Hellings, J)
August 27, 2018 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' 108 Request to Seal Documents, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/24/18. (Marrujo, C)
August 7, 2018 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Defendants' Request to Seal and Striking Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 102 , 104 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/6/2018. (Hellings, J)
July 26, 2018 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Further Briefing Regarding Defendants' 102 Request to Seal, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/25/2018. (Gaumnitz, R)
July 17, 2018 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Plaintiff's Request to File Document Under Seal, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/17/18. (Marrujo, C)
June 26, 2018 97 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation and Order modifying schedule for responses to complaint and proposed amended complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/25/2018. (Rosales, O)
June 19, 2018 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING defendants' Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery by Plaintiffs, document 49 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/18/2018. (Rooney, M)
June 5, 2018 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING defendants' request for sealed hearing transcript, documents 84 85 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/4/2018. (Rooney, M)
June 1, 2018 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on June 1, 2018. (Doc. No. 27) (Munoz, I)
May 31, 2018 83 Opinion or Order of the Court PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR SEALED HEARING TRANSCRIPT; ORDER [Doc 81] signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/31/2018. The Court has considered Plaintiffs' Request for the May 30, 2018 Sealed HearingTranscript on the Motion for Protective Order, and authorizes the court reporter, ECRO - Otilia Rosales, to provide Plaintiffs' counsel with a copy of the Sealed portion of the hearing transcript. (Thorp, J)
May 25, 2018 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Plaintiff's Request to File Documents Under Seal 58 , 76 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/25/2018. (Hellings, J)
April 17, 2018 70 Opinion or Order of the Court Defendant's request for Sealed Hearing Transcript; Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/17/2018. (Rosales, O)
January 26, 2018 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/26/2018. (Rooney, M)
January 23, 2018 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rejecting stipulated protective order 43 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/22/2018. (Rooney, M)
November 9, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Terminate Defendant Flanders Food signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/8/2017. (Jessen, A)
November 8, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 29 Stipulation Modifying Dates for 26 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/7/2017. (The court orders that plaintiff file its opposition to defendant Flanders Food's motion to dismiss no later than 11/14/2017, and defendant Flanders Food file any reply no later than 11/21/2017.)(Gaumnitz, R) Modified (corrected Doc. numbers) on 11/8/2017 (Gaumnitz, R).
August 11, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING the continuance of the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 9/19/2017 and CONTINUING it to 10/31/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/10/2017. (Rooney, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E. & J. Gallo Winery et al v. Instituut Voor Landbouw - En Visserijonderzoek, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. & J. Gallo Winery
Represented By: William Frederick Abrams
Represented By: D. Greg Durbin
Represented By: Sanjeet Kumar Dutta
Represented By: Seth Reed Sias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G3 Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: William Frederick Abrams
Represented By: D. Greg Durbin
Represented By: Sanjeet Kumar Dutta
Represented By: Seth Reed Sias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCD Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: William Frederick Abrams
Represented By: D. Greg Durbin
Represented By: Sanjeet Kumar Dutta
Represented By: Seth Reed Sias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instituut Voor Landbouw - En Visserijonderzoek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eigen Vermogen Vh Instituut Voor Landbouw - En Visserijonderzoek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flanders Food
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?