A.W. v. Tehachapi Unified School District
Plaintiff: A.W.
Defendant: Tehachapi Unified School District
Case Number: 1:2017cv00854
Filed: June 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER AFFIRMING ALJ'S Decision on Appeal 25 ,signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/7/19. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING 39 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and ORDER SEALING 38 Defendant's Filing signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/4/2018. Redacted Filing due within seven (7) days. (Jessen, A)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER After Settlement Conference; ORDER SETTING Further Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/22/2018. Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 7/2/2018 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/13/2018. (The court orders that defendant's response brief is now due by 7/13/2018; plaintiffs reply brief is nowdue by 7/27/2018; and the hearing on this matter is continued to 9/5/2018, at 9:30am in Courtroom 5 before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Gaumnitz, R)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/11/2018. (The court orders that the plaintiff's opening brief is due by 5/18/2018; defendant's response brief is due by 6/22/2018; plaintiff's reply brief is due by 7/13/2018; and the hearing on this matter will be held before 8/28/2018.)(Gaumnitz, R)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 20 Request to File Administrative Record Under Seal, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/2/2018. (Hall, S)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/20/2018. Pleading Amendment Deadline 4/13/2018. Administrative Record Deadline 5/11/2018. Merits Briefing: Opening brief by 5/11/2018; Response by 6/15/2018; Reply by 7/6/2018; Hearing by 8/21/2018. (Hall, S)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM re 2 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/16/2018. Amy Wright is appointed guardian ad litem of A.W., a minor plaintiff. (Jessen, A)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/8/2018. Pleading Amendment Deadline 4/13/2018. Administrative Record Deadline 5/11/2018. Merits Briefing: Opening brief by 5/11/2018; Response by 6/15/2018; Reply by 7/6/2018; Hearing by 8/21/2018. Settlement Conference set for 3/13/2018 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF to Complete the Service Documents and Continuing the Scheduling Conference to January 8, 2018, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/6/2017. USM-285 form due by 10/20/2017. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 1/8/2018 at 08:45 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/2/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.W. v. Tehachapi Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tehachapi Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.W.
Represented By: Lyndsey Gallagher
Represented By: Andrea Moore Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?