Krohe v. Steinhardt
Plaintiff: Christopher David Krohe
Defendant: Zandra Steinhardt
Case Number: 1:2017cv00878
Filed: July 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 23 Motion to Proceed IFP on Appeal signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/6/2017. (Jessen, A)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING 18 Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/5/2017. (Lafata, M)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Case Nos. 1:17-cv-881-DAD-MJS, 1:17-cv-885-DAD-MJS, and 1:17-cv-889-DAD-MJS be consolidated with the instant case and administratively closed; Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed without leave to amend for lack of jurisdiction re 1 Complaint ;referred to Judge Drozd,signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 07/31/2017. Objections to F&R due (14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Relating and Reassigning Cases, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/11/17. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krohe v. Steinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher David Krohe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zandra Steinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?