Sameer v. Right Moves 4U et al
Plaintiff: Madhu Sameer
Defendant: The Right Move 4 U, Michelle Franklin, Dylan Cortina, Conroy Removals LTD, Fiona Conroy, XO Moving Systems, Inc., Talbot Insurance Agency and Monica McKinley
Case Number: 1:2017cv00886
Filed: July 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 99 Motion for Permission to Appeal In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/18/18. (Marrujo, C)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/23/2018. (Kusamura, W)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER DISMISSING 93 Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint for Failure to Follow a Previous Court Order and ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Close the Case signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/22/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion Entitled "Request for Reconsideration of Previous Order" signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 05/08/2018. Amended Complaint due by 5/21/2018.(Flores, E)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER ON TALBOT UNDERWRITING LTD.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO NAME PROPER PARTY; ORDER ON DEFENDANT SHIPCO'S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULE 12(B) (6) OR, ALTERNATIVELY FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT UNDER RULE 12(E) ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/19/2018. (Kusamura, W)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER on Defendant Talbot Insurance Agency's 19 Motion to Dismiss as an Improper Part Under Rule 12(B)(2), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/29/18. Defendant Talbot Insurance Agency's Terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ON DEFENDANT SHIPCO'S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULES 12(B)(4) AND 12(B)(5), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/29/2018. (Kusamura, W)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER as follows: 1) Plaintiff's Motion for Directions Regarding Service (ECF No. 23 ) is DENIED; 2) Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (ECF No. 30 ) is DENIED as moot; 3) Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance (ECF No. 60 ) is GRANTED and the March 14, 2018, Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to June 6, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean; and 4) Ruling is reserved on Plaintiff's Motion to File a Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. 58 ) until such time that Plaintiff properly notices the motion for hearing. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/23/2018. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sameer v. Right Moves 4U et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madhu Sameer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Right Move 4 U
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan Cortina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conroy Removals LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiona Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XO Moving Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talbot Insurance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica McKinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?