Garcia, Jr. v. Asuncion
Petitioner: Omar Garcia, Jr.
Respondent: D. Asuncion
Case Number: 1:2017cv00890
Filed: July 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DECLINING to Issue Certificate of Appealability; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Serve Copy of Order on Ninth Circuit Court of Appeal, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/22/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Denying 31 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/19/18. (Gonzalez, R)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to deny 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/27/2017. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within 21-Days.(Lundstrom, T)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING 2 Petitioner's Motion to File Oversized Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Petition, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/13/17. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia, Jr. v. Asuncion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Omar Garcia, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D. Asuncion
Represented By: Ian Patrick Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?