Herbrand v. Ditech Financial, LLC
Plaintiff: Marcus Herbrand
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00921
Filed: July 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/26/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER TO FURTHER EXTEND DEFENDANTS RESPONSE DEADLINE. The deadline for defendant Ditech Financial LLC to respond to the First Amended Complaint of plaintiff Marcus Herbrand is extended to October 28, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/4/2017. (Hernandez, M)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE DEADLINE, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/11/2017. (Kusamura, W)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE STIPULATION AND CONTINUING MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO NOVEMBER 9, 2017, AT 3:30 P.M. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendants response to Plaintiffs first amended complaint shall be due on or before September 14, 2017; and The mandatory scheduling conference set for September 11, 2017, is continued to November 9, 2017 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 9. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/18/2017. (Hernandez, M)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not be Remanded for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/2/2017. (Defendant Ditech Financial is directed to show cause within fourteen (14) days of service of this order why this case should not be remanded to Kings County Superior Court.)(Gaumnitz, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herbrand v. Ditech Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Herbrand
Represented By: Hayk M. Grigoryan
Represented By: Matin Rajabov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC
Represented By: Xiyi Fu
Represented By: Regina J. McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?