Stewart v. Christianson et al.
Plaintiff: Gerald Stewart
Defendant: Adam Christianson and CFMG dba Correctional Medical Group
Case Number: 1:2017cv00936
Filed: July 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Randomly ASSIGN District Judge to Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss 12 Action, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim, Failure to Obey a Court Order, and Failure to Prosecute; Fourteen (14) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/13/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. The new case number is 1:17-cv-00936-DAD-BAM(PC). (Sant Agata, S)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING 15 Fee Reimbursement Inquiry signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/24/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento, (2:17-cv-1404 CKD) to Fresno (1:17-cv-936 BAM) signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/14/17. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Christianson et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Christianson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFMG dba Correctional Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?