Charles v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Gloria Ann Charles
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv00955
Filed: July 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Directing Entry of Judgment In Favor of the Commissioner of Social Security and Against Plaintiff,signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/16/18. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/11/2018. Show Cause Response due by 5/7/2018.(Flores, E)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to Issue a Summons and New Social Security Case Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/6/17. (Marrujo, C)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Requiring the Filing of an Amended In Forma Pauperis Application, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/20/17. Motion for IFP due by 8/4/2017. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Ann Charles
Represented By: Melissa Newel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sharon Lahey, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?