Wiley v. Kern County Sheriff et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Wiley, Sr.
Defendant: Kern County Sheriff and Medical Detention Staff
Case Number: 1:2017cv00981
Filed: July 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge to Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss 1 Action, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim, Failure to Obey a Court Order, and Failure to Prosecute; Fourteen (14) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/6/2018. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Sant Agata, S)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/19/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING 10 Motion to Proceed IFP and ORDER DENYING 11 Second Motion to Compel AS MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/22/2017. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiley v. Kern County Sheriff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Wiley, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Detention Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?