(PC) Blair v. Mendivil
Plaintiff: Perry C. Blair
Defendant: D. Mendivil
Case Number: 1:2017cv01015
Filed: June 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #36 Order, served on Perry C. Blair. (Gonzalez, R)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Action Pursuant to Parties' #35 Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/15/18. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
November 14, 2018 Filing 35 STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by D. Mendivil. (Walker, Justin)
October 4, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #34 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Perry C. Blair. (Marrujo, C)
October 4, 2018 Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant's Exhaustion Related #20 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/3/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
September 27, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to Calipatria State Prison, P.O. Box 5006, Calipatria, CA 92233 by Perry C. Blair. (Marrujo, C)
September 4, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE by D. Mendivil to #20 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Walker, Justin)
September 4, 2018 Filing 31 REPLY by D. Mendivil to RESPONSE to #20 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Walker, Justin)
August 27, 2018 Filing 30 OPPOSITION to #20 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Perry C. Blair. (Flores, E)
July 23, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #29 Order on Motion for Extension served on Perry C. Blair. (Lundstrom, T)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to file opposition to motion for summary judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/23/2018. Filing Deadline: 9/25/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
July 20, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for 60-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to file opposition re #20 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Perry C. Blair. (Lundstrom, T)
July 17, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 27 Settlement Conference Minutes, served on Perry C. Blair. (Valdez, E)
July 16, 2018 Filing 27 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe at Corcoran State Prison on 7/16/2018: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held; CASE NOT SETTLED. Plaintiff Pro Se: Perry C. Blair, at Corcoran State Prison - present. Defendant's Counsel: Justin Walker, at Corcoran State Prison - present. Court Reporter/CD Number: off the record. (Valdez, E)
July 9, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENT IN PAPER by D. Mendivil: Confidential Settlement Conference Statement. (Walker, Justin)
June 29, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Submission of Confidential Settlement Statement by Perry C. Blair (Martin-Gill, S)
June 25, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #24 Order on Motion for Extension served on Perry C. Blair. (Sant Agata, S)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/25/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
June 22, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for 60-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to Opposition to Summary Judgment by Perry C. Blair. (Flores, E)
June 18, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sean W. Lodholz on behalf of D. Mendivil. Attorney Lodholz, Sean W. added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Lodholz, Sean)
June 15, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #21 Order, served on Perry C. Blair. (Sant Agata, S)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference on July 16, 2018 at Corcoran State Prison signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/13/2018. Settlement Conference set for 7/16/2018 at 08:30 AM at Corcoran State Prison before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Sant Agata, S)
June 6, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by D. Mendivil. (Attachments: #1 RAND Warning to Plaintiff, #2 Points and Authorities, #3 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #4 Declaration of S. Gates (and Exhibits 1 - 3), #5 Proof of Service)(Walker, Justin)
June 6, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #19 Discovery and Scheduling Order served on Perry C. Blair. (Flores, E)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DISCOVERY and SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions filed by 4/15/2019, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/06/2018. (Attachments: #1 Expedited Trial Notice) (Flores, E)
June 1, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER TO PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by D. Mendivil. Attorney Walker, Justin W. added. (Walker, Justin)
April 20, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: D. Mendivil Waiver sent on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Gonzalez, R)
April 2, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #16 Order Directing Service by USM served on Perry C. Blair. (Jessen, A)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DIRECTING USM to serve * Complaint * filed on * June 30, 2017,* on * D. Mendivil*, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/2/2018. Service Deadline set for 7/5/2018. (Jessen, A)
April 2, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS: 1 Summons, 1 USM-285 Form, and 2 copies of the Complaint by Perry C. Blair. (Jessen, A)
February 22, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Service Documents Order, served on Perry C. Blair. (Marrujo, C)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FORWARDING Plaintiff the Necessary Service of Process Forms for Completion and Return Within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/22/18. Service is appropriate for D. Mendivil. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summons, 1 USM-285 Forms, and 1 copy of the Complaint filed on 6/30/17. Case Management Deadline: 3/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 PC USM Instructions) (Marrujo, C)
February 21, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, served on Perry C. Blair. (Marrujo, C)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING #8 Findings and Recommendations, Allowing Action to Proceed on Plaintiff's Claim of Deliberate Indifference Against Certain Individuals and Dismissing All Other Claims and Defendants, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/20/18. (Marrujo, C)
January 26, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief served on Perry C. Blair. (Flores, E)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's #11 Motion for Issuance of Summons and Forms for Service of Process by the United States Marshal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/26/2018. (Flores, E)
January 24, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Summons and US Marshals Form by Perry C. Blair. (Flores, E)
December 13, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to CSP-Corcoran, PO Box 3476, Corcoran, CA 93212 by Perry C. Blair. (Sant Agata, S)
December 13, 2017 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS to #8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Perry C. Blair. (Sant Agata, S)
November 22, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Findings and Recommendations served on Perry C. Blair. (Jessen, A)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Assign a District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action Proceed on Plaintiff's Claim of Deliberate Indifference Against Certain Defendants and Dismissal of All Other Claims and Defendants re #2 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/22/2017. This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is 1:17-cv-01015-DAD-SAB (PC). Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
August 4, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Perry C. Blair. (Flores, E)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/04/2017. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Flores, E)
August 2, 2017 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Perry C. Blair. (Flores, E)
August 2, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #2 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint served on Perry C. Blair. (Flores, E)
August 2, 2017 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/5/2017. (Flores, E)
August 2, 2017 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Perry C. Blair, CDC G-00398 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Flores, E)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Open New Action and the Amended Complaint, Filed by Plaintiff on June 30, 2017, be the Operative Complaint in the New Action and Directing Defendants to File a Further Response to the Second Amended Complaint within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/01/2017.(Flores, E)
June 30, 2017 Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Perry C. Blair. (Flores, E)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against D. Mendivil by Perry C. Blair.(Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Blair v. Mendivil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Mendivil
Represented By: Justin W. Walker
Represented By: Sean W. Lodholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry C. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?