sbe Licensing, LLC v. HCKUSA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: sbe Licensing, LLC
Defendant: HCKUSA, Inc. and Lewis Everk
Case Number: 1:2017cv01043
Filed: August 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case and Adjust Docket to Reflect Voluntary Dismissal 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/26/17. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/18/2017 discharging Order to Show Cause and continuing Scheduling Conference re 12 , 13 . (Lundstrom, T)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within five days of the date of entry of this order, Plaintiff shall show cause in writing why this action should not be di smissed for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff is advised that failure to file a response in compliance with this order may result in the issuance of sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/13/2017. (Hernandez, M)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER RE EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS HCKUSA, INC. AND LEWIS EVERK TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants HCKUSA, Inc. and Lewis Everk are granted an extension of up to and including October 3, 2017, to file their response to the complaint in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/6/2017. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: sbe Licensing, LLC v. HCKUSA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: sbe Licensing, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Represented By: Michael Niborski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCKUSA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Everk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?