Roadrunner Intermodal Services, LLC v. T.G.S. Transportation, Inc.

Plaintiff: Roadrunner Intermodal Services, LLC
Defendant: T.G.S. Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv01056
Filed: August 7, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant T.G.S. Transportation, Inc.'s 75 Request to Seal, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/29/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
October 26, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Non-Party Minturn Nut Co., Inc.'s EX PARTE Motion to Quash Subpoena and for a Protective Order (Doc. 51). For the reasons stated, Minturns ex parte motion to quash subpoena and for a prot ective order is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: (1.) The motion quash the October 20, 2017 subpoena is granted to the extent it seeks Minturn, as a business entity, to respond to the document requests; (2.) The motion to quash and request for protective order to excuse Ms. Vizcarras appearance at the deposition is denied; (3.) Ms. Vizcarra will be required to appear at the noticed deposition and produce anydocuments that she has responsive to the subpoena requests. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/26/2017. (Herman, H)
October 23, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER: In addition to the above Stipulation between the parties---which the Court adopts in its entirety---the Court further ORDERS parties seeking to file a document falling within this Protective Order to comply with Local Rul es 141 and 141.1. Within five (5) days of a written order of the Court allowing a document to be filed under seal, the party shall file a redacted copy of the document so filed. The redactions shall be narrowly tailored to protect only the information that is confidential or was deemed confidential. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/23/2017. (Herman, H)
October 18, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Applicant Jeffrey Cox's 42 Ex Parte Application to Intervene for Hearing, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/18/2017. (All three pending 30 32 42 motions are set for hearing on 11/7/2017, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.) (Gaumnitz, R)
October 17, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Ex Parte Application for a Protective Order on or before Monday, October 23, 2017 (ECF No. 41 ) and ORDER Partially Staying Discovery Pending Resolution of Ex Parte Applic ation for Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/17/2017. It is hereby ordered as follows: (1) Plaintiff Roadrunner Intermodal Services, Inc. shall file a response to Defendant's ex parte application for pr otective order on or before Monday, October 23, 2017; and (2) Pending resolution of the ex parte application for protective order, discovery between the parties is STAYED, including the noticed deposition of Defendant's Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) witness and the noticed deposition of its founder, Mr. Tim Schneider. Third-party discovery is not stayed at this time. (Valdez, E)
October 13, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 34 Exparte Application to Shorten Time for a Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/13/2017. (The parties are directed to the briefing schedule outlined in Local Rule 78-230 with respect to plaintiffs pending motion for preliminary injunction, which will be heard before this court on November 7, 2017.) (Gaumnitz, R)
September 15, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING and REASSIGNING Cases, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/13/17. (Marrujo, C)
August 31, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING In Part and Denying In Part Plaintiff's Renewed 9 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Conduct Expedited Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/30/17. (Marrujo, C)
August 29, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint STIPULATION to Extend Defendant T.G.S. Transportation, Inc's Time to Respond to Complaint; ORDER: that the deadline for TGS to respond to Roadrunners Complaint be extended to September 1, 2017. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/29/2017. (Herman, H)
August 9, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not be Dismissed for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/9/2017. (Plaintiff is hereby directed to show cause within fourteen (14) days of service of this order as to why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction.) (Gaumnitz, R)
August 8, 2017 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Ex Parte Application for Expedited Discovery without prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/8/2017. (Valdez, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roadrunner Intermodal Services, LLC v. T.G.S. Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roadrunner Intermodal Services, LLC
Represented By: Kurt A. Kappes
Represented By: Michael Dominick Lane
Represented By: Sean Allan Newland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.G.S. Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Scott J. Ivy
Represented By: Shane Garrett Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?