Mills v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Debra Kay Mills
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv01091
Filed: August 14, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 20 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Appeal From the Decision of the Commissioner of Social Security signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/20/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME. Defendants response to Plaintiffs opening brief shall be filed on or before June 27, 2018; and Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed on or before July 12, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/8/2018. (Hernandez, M)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE PARTIES STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO SERVE LETTER BRIEF. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve her letter brief on or before March 9, 2018. The Courts Scheduling Order shall be modified accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/7/2018. (Hernandez, M)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING 2 , 4 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/22/2017. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Kay Mills
Represented By: Sharon E. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Chantal Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?