LM v. Kern High School District

Plaintiff: LM
Defendant: Kern High School District
Case Number: 1:2017cv01123
Filed: August 21, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Referring Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 26 re Inspection of Plaintiff's Home and Classroom, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/31/2018. (Hall, S)
July 30, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 22 Stipulation to Extend Expert Discovery Deadlines, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/28/2018. (Hall, S)
July 2, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 20 to Extend Discovery Deadlines, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/2/2018. (Hall, S)
November 20, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/20/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 2/16/2018. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 12/18/2017; Non-Expert 7/27/2018; Expert 9/21/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 4/9/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 10/9/2018; Hearing by 11/6/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 11/20/2018; Hearing by 1/15 /2019. Settlement Conference set for 12/3/2018 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 3/25/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial set for 5/21/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
October 11, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Withdraw 7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and ORDER GRANTING 3 Petitioner's Motion Appointing Guardian Ad Litem signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/11/2017. Amended Complaint due by 10/13/2017. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LM v. Kern High School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LM
Represented By: Joel T Andreesen
Represented By: Jose Miguel Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern High School District
Represented By: Daniel Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?