Molina v. D. Scott Carruthers, PLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Maria Molina
Defendant: D. Scott Carruthers, PLC and SFM-6, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv01158
Filed: August 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Closing Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/2/18. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING 14 Plaintiffs' Motion for an Extension of Time to File the Dismissal Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/14/2017. Stipulated dismissal due by 3/30/2018. (Hall, S)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AFTER 12 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/6/2017. Stipulated request for dismissal due by 12/30/2017. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. (Hall, S)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING Entry of Judgment in the amount of $2,001.00 in Plaintiff's favor, in accordance with the offer of judgment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/19/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molina v. D. Scott Carruthers, PLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Molina
Represented By: Joshua Michael Biletsky
Represented By: Elliot Albert Rosenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Scott Carruthers, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFM-6, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?