Roe v. Davey et al
Plaintiff: Michael Mathew Roe
Defendant: Dave Davey, Gutierez, E. Moreno, D. Williamson and J. Cano
Case Number: 1:2017cv01221
Filed: September 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Notice to Court Regarding Settlement 33 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/30/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Regarding Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/22/19. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Following Settlement; Vacating Dates; and Directing Parties to File Dispositional Documents,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/19/2019. (Case Management Deadline: 15 Day Deadline), CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that Inmate Michael Mathew Roe is No Longer Needed as a Witness in these proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is DISCHARGED, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/19/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM TO TRANSPORT Michael Mathew Roe, CDCR# K-41522 on March 19, 2019 at 10:30 a.m., Fresno, CA, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 02/12/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR and Staying Case for 90 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/7/2019. Settlement Conference set for 3/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. CASE STAYED. (Jessen, A)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Submit Completed Service Documents or SHOW CAUSE Why This Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/24/2018. Completed Service Documents or Show Cause Response due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER adopting 14 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding dismissal of certain claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/5/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge to Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/16/2018. This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is 1:17-cv-01221-DAD-BAM (PC). Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roe v. Davey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mathew Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gutierez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?