Kuehling v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Roland Kuehling
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv01225
Filed: September 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause and Directing Clerk of the Court to Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/16/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Requiring Parties to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Issue for Failure to Comply with Court Orders, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/3/18. Show Cause Response Due Within Ten Days. (Gonzalez, R)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Following Settlement; Vacating Dates and Directing Parties to File Dispositive Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/17/18. 30-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Continuing Settlement Conference to January 17, 2018 at 12:30 p.m.,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/11/18. (Settlement Conference set for 1/17/2018 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING 10 Motion for PRA Representative to Appear via Telephone at Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/9/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONTINUING Initial Scheduling Conference; ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE and Settlement Instructions signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/5/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuehling v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Kuehling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Represented By: Nathan A Searles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?